E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6918
|
E
|
05/20/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4766
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2609
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4181
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4338
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4120
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2379
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2379
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2379
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2379
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2379
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2379
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2379
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2195
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1277
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1277
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 976
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1599
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1521
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#282
|
Journal Page: 1521
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1521
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1521
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1497
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1497
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1497
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1098
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2011
|
Referred to Business & Industry
|
|
Journal Page: 525
|
House
|
02/28/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 525
|
House
|
01/28/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|