E
|
06/17/2011
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6919
|
E
|
05/27/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6459
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4010
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5956
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6284
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5384
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3323
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3323
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3323
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3323
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3323
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3323
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3323
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2309
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2193
|
Senate
|
05/02/2011
|
Referred to Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 1630
|
Senate
|
05/02/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1630
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1363
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2391
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2191
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#511
|
Journal Page: 2191
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2191
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2191
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2177
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2179
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2179
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2006
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2011
|
Referred to Urban Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 525
|
House
|
02/28/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 525
|
House
|
01/28/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|