E
|
05/27/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/27/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6460
|
E
|
05/16/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4125
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2327
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3826
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3968
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3650
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2212
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2212
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2212
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2211
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2211
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2211
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2211
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1920
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Referred to Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 1336
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Rereferred to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 1336
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 1277
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1277
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1008
|
House
|
04/08/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1662
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#294
|
Journal Page: 1582
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1582
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1582
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1562
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1562
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1098
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 683
|
House
|
02/28/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 525
|
House
|
02/28/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 525
|
House
|
01/28/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|