E | 06/17/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6919 | |
E | 05/20/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4766 | |
Senate | 05/20/2011 | Co-sponsor authorized | Journal Page: 2709 | |
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2609 | |
House | 05/18/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4181 | |
House | 05/18/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4338 | |
House | 05/16/2011 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4062 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2324 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2324 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Read | Journal Page: 2324 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2323 | |
Senate | 03/21/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 624 | |
House | 03/17/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 838 | |
House | 03/17/2011 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 838 | |
House | 03/17/2011 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/15/2011 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/14/2011 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 787 | |
House | 03/10/2011 | Filed |