E | 05/28/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6874 | |
E | 05/18/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4338 | |
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2469 | |
House | 05/16/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4060 | |
House | 05/15/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4064 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3828 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 2269 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2239 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3656 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 3656 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/10/2011 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 04/19/2011 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 1993 | |
House | 04/12/2011 | Filed |