E | 05/09/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3527 | |
E | 04/29/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2658 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1386 | |
House | 04/28/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2385 | |
House | 04/27/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2392 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 2260 | |
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 1343 | |
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1301 | |
House | 04/21/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2103 | |
House | 04/21/2011 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 2103 | |
House | 04/20/2011 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 2087 | |
House | 04/20/2011 | Correction in referral | Journal Page: 2087 | |
House | 04/18/2011 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 1907 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Filed |