E | 06/17/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6919 | |
E | 05/20/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4766 | |
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2609 | |
House | 05/18/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4181 | |
House | 05/18/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4338 | |
House | 05/17/2011 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4123 | |
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 2509 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2239 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3656 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 3656 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/10/2011 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 05/04/2011 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 2909 | |
House | 04/27/2011 | Filed |