E | 04/15/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1909 | |
E | 04/07/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1642 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 996 | |
House | 04/07/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 1570 | |
House | 04/07/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1642 | |
House | 04/05/2011 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 1502 | |
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 901 | |
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 542 | |
House | 03/16/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 812 | |
House | 03/16/2011 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 812 | |
House | 03/16/2011 | Filed |