E | 06/17/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6919 | |
E | 05/27/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6460 | |
Senate | 05/26/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 4013 | |
House | 05/26/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5957 | |
House | 05/26/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 6284 | |
House | 05/25/2011 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 5760 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3551 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3551 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Read | Journal Page: 3551 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 3549 | |
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2568 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 4190 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 4190 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/17/2011 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 05/11/2011 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 3641 | |
House | 05/09/2011 | Filed |