Senate | 05/25/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 3574 | |
House | 05/25/2011 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 5422 | |
House | 05/25/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 5421 | |
House | 05/25/2011 | Record vote | RV#1405 | Journal Page: 5422 |
House | 05/25/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 5422 | |
House | 05/25/2011 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 5416 | |
House | 05/25/2011 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/23/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/23/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/23/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/23/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 5399 | |
House | 05/21/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/21/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/21/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/18/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/18/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/18/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/18/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/11/2011 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 3641 | |
House | 05/10/2011 | Filed |