E | 05/28/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6874 | |
E | 05/18/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4338 | |
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2469 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3965 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4064 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3860 | |
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2275 | |
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Adopted | HB 1951 | Journal Page: 2275 |
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Read | Journal Page: 2275 | |
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2274 | |
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2274 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Record vote | RV#1038 | Journal Page: 3786 |
House | 05/12/2011 | Adopted | HB 1951 | Journal Page: 3786 |
House | 05/12/2011 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 3786 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Filed | ||
05/12/2011 | Laid before the House |