E | 05/26/2011 | Filed with the Secretary of State | Journal Page: 6284 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3773 | |
House | 05/25/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5417 | |
House | 05/25/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 5964 | |
House | 05/23/2011 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 5046 | |
Senate | 05/23/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3149 | |
Senate | 05/23/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3149 | |
Senate | 05/23/2011 | Read | Journal Page: 3149 | |
Senate | 05/23/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 3149 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2336 | |
House | 05/16/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3971 | |
House | 05/16/2011 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 3971 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Filed |