Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HCR166 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.C.R. No. 166


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, May 18, 2011, marked the 10th anniversary of the
 untimely passing of John Austin Pena of Edinburg, and a new drug
 treatment center being completed in Hidalgo County has been named
 the John Austin Pena Memorial Center in honor of this beloved young
 man; and
 WHEREAS, We stand together in commemoration of John's life
 with his loving family members: his father and stepmother, Aaron
 Pena, Jr., and Monica Pena; his mother, Criselda Pena; his dear
 siblings, Adrienne Pena-Garza, Aaron Leonel Pena, Alyssa Victoria
 Pena, and Michael Anthony Pena; his beloved young daughter, Chelsea
 Pena, and all his other relatives; and
 WHEREAS, John Austin Pena was born at Park Place Hospital in
 Houston on October 4, 1984; he was a bright, spirited, cheerful
 young man who had many good friends; his broad spectrum of interests
 ranged from sports--especially basketball, soccer, and
 baseball--to skateboarding and playing laser tag with his pals and
 playing video games with his younger brother "Mikey"; endowed with
 a lively imagination and curiosity, he also enjoyed writing and
 traveling; and
 WHEREAS, On May 18, 2001, the limitless potential that was
 embodied in the life of John Austin Pena was tragically brought to
 an untimely end when he and two other young people attending a
 social gathering were encouraged to ingest a substance, distributed
 at the gathering, that later proved to be deadly to all three; his
 death and absence caused considerable anguish among his friends and
 relatives, particularly his parents and siblings; many were led to
 channel their deep remorse by seeking solutions to the growing drug
 epidemic among our youth, with particular attention to those living
 along the Texas-Mexico border; and
 WHEREAS, In June 2002, John's father, Aaron Pena, embarked on
 a journey to examine how Texas was dealing with rising drug abuse;
 he began visiting drug treatment centers across Texas to raise
 awareness of the growing problem, and the endeavor culminated with
 a visit to La Hacienda Drug Treatment Center in Hunt; in order to
 bring attention to the lack of treatment facilities in Texas,
 Representative Pena walked 125 miles from La Hacienda treatment
 center to our state Capitol in Austin; as a result of that visit, he
 made a promise to bring a drug treatment center to South Texas; and
 WHEREAS, In 2004, to further this goal of drug abuse
 awareness, the John Austin Pena Memorial Scholarship was
 established in John's memory by the Texas Association of Addiction
 Professionals; the scholarship is presented annually to a student
 in recovery who is pursuing a college degree; and
 WHEREAS, On May 18, 2007, through the diligent work of his
 father, State Representative Aaron Pena, the Texas House of
 Representatives gave budgetary approval for a drug treatment
 facility in the Rio Grande Valley; on March 26, 2010, Hidalgo County
 held a ground-breaking ceremony for the substance abuse treatment
 facility located at 3341 E. Richardson Road in Edinburg; and
 WHEREAS, On May 17, 2011, the Hidalgo County Commissioners
 Court unanimously voted to not only memorialize the legacy of a
 young life cut short, but also recognize the efforts of those
 inspired by that tragedy to combat the evils of drug abuse, by
 ordering that the Hidalgo County Substance Abuse Treatment Facility
 be designated the John Austin Pena Memorial Center; and
 WHEREAS, The new John Austin Pena Memorial Center, opening in
 the fall of 2011, will provide substance abuse treatment services
 to adolescents on an outpatient basis; although John Pena is deeply
 missed by his loved ones, the scholarship and the drug treatment
 center that bear his name increase awareness and offer hope of a
 brighter future to young people struggling to move beyond
 addiction; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 82nd Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the memory of John Austin Pena on the 10th
 anniversary of his passing and commemorate the naming of the John
 Austin Pena Memorial Center in his honor.
 Guillen
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 166 was adopted by the House on May
 25, 2011, by a non-record vote.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 166 was adopted by the Senate on May
 27, 2011, by a viva-voce vote.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor