E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6919
|
E
|
05/23/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5399
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2969
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4761
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4766
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4337
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2588
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 2588
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2588
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2588
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2588
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2610
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2374
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2308
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2309
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1706
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1706
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1094
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1866
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1755
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1755
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#371
|
Journal Page: 1754
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Adopted as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1754
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Amendment tabled
|
7-Alonzo and Y. Davis
|
Journal Page: 1753
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
1-Creighton
|
Journal Page: 1746
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1746
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Amendment amended
|
2-Simpson
|
Journal Page: 1746
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
1-Creighton
|
Journal Page: 1746
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1745
|
House
|
04/08/2011
|
Postponed
|
4/13/11 10:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 1629
|
House
|
04/08/2011
|
Laid before the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1629
|
House
|
04/08/2011
|
Placed on Resolutions Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 790
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2011
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 609
|
House
|
02/18/2011
|
Referred to State Sovereignty, Select
|
|
Journal Page: 414
|
House
|
11/08/2010
|
Filed
|
|
|