E | 01/28/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 258 | |
E | 01/19/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 77 | |
Senate | 01/19/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 42 | |
House | 01/13/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 56 | |
House | 01/13/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 69 | |
House | 01/13/2011 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 57 | |
Senate | 01/12/2011 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 24 | |
Senate | 01/12/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 22 | |
House | 01/12/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 29 | |
House | 01/12/2011 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 29 | |
House | 01/04/2011 | Filed |