E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6919
|
E
|
05/20/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4766
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2609
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4181
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4338
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4122
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2383
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 2383
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2383
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2383
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2195
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Referred to Administration
|
|
Journal Page: 1278
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1278
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 843
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#163
|
Journal Page: 1132
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 1132
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Laid before the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1125
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 922
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2011
|
Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
|
|
Journal Page: 415
|
House
|
01/11/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|