E | 03/24/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1099 | |
E | 03/17/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 923 | |
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 540 | |
House | 03/16/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 830 | |
House | 03/16/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 904 | |
House | 03/15/2011 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 805 | |
Senate | 03/14/2011 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 524 | |
Senate | 02/02/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 252 | |
House | 02/02/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 268 | |
House | 02/02/2011 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 268 | |
House | 01/25/2011 | Filed |