E | 06/17/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6919 | |
E | 05/26/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6284 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3773 | |
House | 05/25/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5417 | |
House | 05/24/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 5764 | |
House | 05/23/2011 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 5044 | |
Senate | 05/23/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 3113 | |
Senate | 05/23/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3113 | |
Senate | 05/23/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3113 | |
Senate | 05/23/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 3113 | |
Senate | 05/23/2011 | Co-sponsor authorized | Journal Page: 3318 | |
Senate | 05/23/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/20/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/20/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2710 | |
Senate | 05/18/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/18/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | Journal Page: 2267 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2267 | |
Senate | 05/04/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1714 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2684 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Record vote | RV#630 | Journal Page: 2688 |
House | 05/03/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2688 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 2680 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2390 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/20/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/19/2011 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1991 | |
House | 02/18/2011 | Referred to Corrections | Journal Page: 416 | |
House | 01/27/2011 | Filed |