E | 02/07/2011 | Filed with the Secretary of State | Journal Page: 297 | |
Senate | 02/07/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 277 | |
House | 02/03/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 274 | |
House | 02/03/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 281 | |
House | 02/02/2011 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 270 | |
Senate | 02/01/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 246 | |
Senate | 02/01/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 246 | |
Senate | 02/01/2011 | Read | Journal Page: 246 | |
Senate | 02/01/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 246 | |
Senate | 01/31/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 202 | |
House | 01/27/2011 | Record vote | RV#34 | Journal Page: 251 |
House | 01/27/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 251 | |
House | 01/27/2011 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 251 | |
House | 01/27/2011 | Filed |