House | 05/05/2011 | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. | Journal Page: 2930 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 2930 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2657 | |
House | 04/27/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2298 | |
House | 02/18/2011 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 416 | |
House | 01/27/2011 | Filed |