Senate | 05/02/2011 | Printed in full | Journal Page: 1648 | |
Senate | 05/02/2011 | Again read | Journal Page: 1609 | |
Senate | 05/02/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1609 | |
E | 04/01/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1464 | |
E | 03/23/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1089 | |
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 657 | |
House | 03/22/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 940 | |
House | 03/22/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1072 | |
House | 03/21/2011 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 921 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 616 | |
Senate | 02/28/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 428 | |
House | 02/24/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 496 | |
House | 02/24/2011 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 496 | |
House | 02/24/2011 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 02/22/2011 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 02/16/2011 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 374 | |
House | 01/28/2011 | Filed |