E | 02/24/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 541 | |
E | 02/17/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 443 | |
Senate | 02/17/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 347 | |
House | 02/17/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 424 | |
House | 02/17/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 442 | |
House | 02/16/2011 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 392 | |
Senate | 02/15/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 328 | |
Senate | 02/15/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 328 | |
Senate | 02/15/2011 | Read | Journal Page: 328 | |
Senate | 02/15/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 328 | |
Senate | 02/15/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 322 | |
House | 02/15/2011 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 349 | |
House | 02/07/2011 | Filed |