Senate | 05/13/2011 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 2307 | |
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2307 | |
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2305 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3863 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Record vote | RV#1044 | Journal Page: 3867 |
House | 05/13/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3867 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 3857 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/12/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2657 | |
House | 04/27/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/20/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/20/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/18/2011 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 416 | |
House | 02/08/2011 | Filed |