E | 03/24/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1099 | |
E | 03/17/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 923 | |
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 540 | |
House | 03/16/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 830 | |
House | 03/16/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 904 | |
House | 03/10/2011 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 771 | |
Senate | 03/09/2011 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 514 | |
Senate | 03/09/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 508 | |
House | 03/08/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 707 | |
House | 03/08/2011 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 707 | |
House | 02/16/2011 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 374 | |
House | 02/08/2011 | Filed |