E | 03/17/2011 | Filed with the Secretary of State | Journal Page: 923 | |
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 540 | |
House | 03/16/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 830 | |
House | 03/16/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 904 | |
House | 03/15/2011 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 805 | |
Senate | 03/14/2011 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 524 | |
Senate | 02/14/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 316 | |
House | 02/09/2011 | Record vote | RV#44 | Journal Page: 305 |
House | 02/09/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 305 | |
House | 02/09/2011 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 304 | |
House | 02/09/2011 | Filed |