House | 05/18/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/19/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2006 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/28/2011 | Referred to State Sovereignty, Select | Journal Page: 541 | |
House | 02/28/2011 | Correction in referral | Journal Page: 541 | |
House | 02/18/2011 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 417 | |
House | 02/15/2011 | Filed |