E | 04/07/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1642 | |
E | 03/30/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1228 | |
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 812 | |
House | 03/30/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 1126 | |
House | 03/30/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1228 | |
House | 03/28/2011 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 1097 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 746 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 746 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Read | Journal Page: 746 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 746 | |
Senate | 03/07/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 480 | |
House | 03/03/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 604 | |
House | 03/03/2011 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 604 | |
House | 03/03/2011 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/01/2011 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 02/21/2011 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 437 | |
House | 02/15/2011 | Filed |