E | 04/15/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1909 | |
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Again read | Journal Page: 1054 | |
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1054 | |
E | 04/07/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1642 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 996 | |
House | 04/07/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 1570 | |
House | 04/07/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1642 | |
House | 04/05/2011 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 1502 | |
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 901 | |
Senate | 03/31/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 843 | |
House | 03/31/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1162 | |
House | 03/31/2011 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 1162 | |
House | 03/31/2011 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 02/21/2011 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 437 | |
House | 02/15/2011 | Filed |