Senate | 05/20/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2688 | |
House | 05/20/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4380 | |
House | 05/20/2011 | Record vote | RV#1195 | Journal Page: 4379 |
House | 05/20/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 4379 | |
House | 05/20/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 4379 | |
House | 05/18/2011 | Postponed | 5/20/11 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 4149 |
House | 05/18/2011 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 4149 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Placed on Resolutions Calendar | ||
House | 05/09/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/02/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/01/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1463 | |
House | 03/30/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/09/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/09/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/09/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/09/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/18/2011 | Referred to Environmental Regulation | Journal Page: 417 | |
House | 02/16/2011 | Filed |