E | 06/17/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6919 | |
E | 05/23/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5399 | |
Senate | 05/21/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2969 | |
House | 05/21/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4761 | |
House | 05/20/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4766 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4224 | |
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2564 | |
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2564 | |
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2564 | |
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2564 | |
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/18/2011 | Co-sponsor authorized | Journal Page: 2551 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2270 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/03/2011 | Meeting cancelled | ||
Senate | 05/03/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1278 | |
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1278 | |
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 933 | |
House | 04/05/2011 | Record vote | RV#271 | Journal Page: 1500 |
House | 04/05/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1500 | |
House | 04/05/2011 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 1500 | |
House | 04/05/2011 | Placed on Resolutions Calendar | ||
House | 03/31/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/23/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1072 | |
House | 03/21/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/21/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/21/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/10/2011 | Referred to Border & Intergovernmental Affairs | Journal Page: 767 | |
House | 02/21/2011 | Filed |