Senate | 05/16/2011 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 2374 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2374 | |
Senate | 04/27/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1371 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2177 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2177 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 2177 | |
House | 04/06/2011 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 1543 | |
House | 02/28/2011 | Filed |