E | 03/24/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1099 | |
E | 03/17/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 923 | |
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 540 | |
House | 03/16/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 830 | |
House | 03/16/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 904 | |
House | 03/15/2011 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 805 | |
Senate | 03/14/2011 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 523 | |
Senate | 03/14/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 520 | |
House | 03/10/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 744 | |
House | 03/10/2011 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 744 | |
House | 03/10/2011 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/08/2011 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/01/2011 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 573 | |
House | 02/28/2011 | Filed |