E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6919
|
E
|
05/27/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6460
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4013
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5957
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6284
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5760
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3560
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 3560
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3560
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3560
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2975
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2656
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Referred to Government Organization
|
|
Journal Page: 2146
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2146
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2059
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#720
|
Journal Page: 2930
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 2930
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Laid before the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2930
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2657
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
|
|
Journal Page: 803
|
House
|
03/07/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|