Senate | 05/09/2011 | Referred to Agriculture & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 2146 | |
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2146 | |
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2059 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2946 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Record vote | RV#722 | Journal Page: 2946 |
House | 05/05/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2946 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 2930 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2657 | |
House | 04/27/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Meeting cancelled | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/18/2011 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 898 | |
House | 03/11/2011 | Filed |