Senate | 05/04/2011 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1746 | |
Senate | 05/04/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1746 | |
Senate | 04/27/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1371 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Record vote | RV#511 | Journal Page: 2196 |
House | 04/26/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2196 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 2189 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1866 | |
House | 04/12/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/18/2011 | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services | Journal Page: 898 | |
House | 03/11/2011 | Filed |