E
|
05/27/2011
|
Filed with the Secretary of State
|
|
Journal Page: 6460
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4013
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5957
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5964
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3338
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4994
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1339
|
Journal Page: 4994
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4994
|
House
|
05/22/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4764
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2756
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2756
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2756
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2756
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2756
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2756
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2756
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2710
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 2267
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2267
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2240
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3968
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3564
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#967
|
Journal Page: 3563
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Adopted as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3563
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3562
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Orr
|
Journal Page: 3562
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3562
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Postponed
|
5/10/11 9:30 PM
|
Journal Page: 3404
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3404
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2796
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1473
|
House
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
Journal Page: 768
|
House
|
03/10/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 768
|
House
|
03/02/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|