House | 05/04/2011 | Postponed | 7/4/11 12:01 PM | Journal Page: 2819 |
House | 05/04/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2819 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2699 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Record vote | RV#637 | Journal Page: 2698 |
House | 05/03/2011 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2698 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Amended | 1-Solomons | Journal Page: 2698 |
House | 05/03/2011 | Point of order overruled | Rule 4, Section 32(c)(1) | Journal Page: 2698 |
House | 05/03/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2698 | |
House | 05/02/2011 | Postponed | 5/3/11 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 2637 |
House | 05/02/2011 | Point of order withdrawn | Rule 4, Section 32(c) | Journal Page: 2637 |
House | 05/02/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2637 | |
House | 05/02/2011 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/15/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1908 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/31/2011 | Meeting cancelled | ||
House | 03/31/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1138 | |
House | 03/14/2011 | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development | Journal Page: 787 | |
House | 03/14/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 787 | |
House | 03/08/2011 | Filed |