Senate | 05/13/2011 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 2307 | |
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2307 | |
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2274 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3968 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3718 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Record vote | RV#1025 | Journal Page: 3718 |
House | 05/12/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3718 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3718 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | ||
House | 05/10/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/09/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/07/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/07/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3300 | |
House | 05/06/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/06/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/17/2011 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 407 | |
House | 02/17/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 407 | |
House | 12/22/2010 | Filed |