House | 05/05/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2953 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Record vote | RV#730 | Journal Page: 2952 |
House | 05/05/2011 | Failed of adoption | Journal Page: 2952 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2952 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Reason for vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2862 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2862 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Record vote | RV#707 | Journal Page: 2861 |
House | 05/04/2011 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2861 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2861 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2861 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/13/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1768 | |
House | 04/04/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/21/2011 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 441 | |
House | 02/21/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 441 | |
House | 01/11/2011 | Filed |