E
|
05/26/2011
|
Filed with the Secretary of State
|
|
Journal Page: 6284
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3773
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5417
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5764
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5045
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3110
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3110
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3110
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3110
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3110
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3110
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3110
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2612
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2506
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 2146
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2146
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2059
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3202
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2955
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#731
|
Journal Page: 2954
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Adopted as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2954
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2953
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Pickett and Harper-Brown
|
Journal Page: 2953
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2953
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2867
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#709
|
Journal Page: 2867
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2867
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 2867
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2863
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2863
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1546
|
House
|
03/28/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2011
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 441
|
House
|
02/21/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 441
|
House
|
01/12/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|