House | 04/19/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2005 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/01/2011 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 573 | |
House | 03/01/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 573 | |
House | 02/10/2011 | Filed |