House | 04/13/2011 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 04/07/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1556 | |
House | 04/07/2011 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 1556 | |
House | 04/07/2011 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 1147 | |
House | 03/24/2011 | Filed |