House | 03/16/2011 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 03/03/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 601 | |
House | 03/03/2011 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 601 | |
House | 02/24/2011 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 491 | |
House | 02/24/2011 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 02/22/2011 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 02/14/2011 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 345 | |
House | 01/11/2011 | Filed |