House | 04/11/2011 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 04/07/2011 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1507 | |
House | 04/06/2011 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 1507 | |
House | 04/05/2011 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 1147 | |
House | 03/24/2011 | Filed |