LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2011 - 82nd Regular
House
Bills
HR1059
Action History
TX
Texas House Bill HR1059
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular
Texas House Bill HR1059
Action History
04/15/2011
Reported enrolled
04/07/2011
Adopted
04/07/2011
Laid before the House
04/07/2011
Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
04/05/2011
Considered in Rules and Resolutions
03/30/2011
Referred to Rules & Resolutions
03/28/2011
Filed