House | 04/15/2011 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/13/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1688 | |
House | 04/13/2011 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 1688 | |
House | 04/12/2011 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 1476 | |
House | 03/29/2011 | Filed |