House | 04/28/2011 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 2328 | |
House | 04/28/2011 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 2095 | |
House | 04/21/2011 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/19/2011 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 04/08/2011 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 1637 | |
House | 04/05/2011 | Filed |