House | 04/25/2011 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1780 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 1780 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 04/08/2011 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 1640 | |
House | 04/05/2011 | Filed |