House | 03/10/2011 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 744 | |
House | 03/10/2011 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/08/2011 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 02/24/2011 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 497 | |
House | 02/24/2011 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 02/22/2011 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 02/16/2011 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 375 | |
House | 01/14/2011 | Filed |