House | 05/21/2011 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/19/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 4189 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 4189 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 3663 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/10/2011 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 2784 | |
House | 04/20/2011 | Filed |